U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00001-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. CANNON et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 05, 2021: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
April, 2021
  • April 20, 2021: [Order to Surrender]
March, 2021
  • March 25, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Want of Prosecution]
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 20, 2020: [Judgment]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
February, 2020
  • February 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: [Order]
  • January 23, 2020: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
  • January 23, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
December, 2019
  • December 10, 2019: [Order]
October, 2019
  • October 25, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Order]
August, 2019
  • August 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • August 04, 2019: [Order]
June, 2019
  • June 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Order]
April, 2019
  • April 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • April 05, 2019: [Order]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • February 19, 2019: [Order]
January, 2019
  • January 22, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • January 15, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 14, 2019: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.