U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:19-cr-00003-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. MOORE et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 13, 2021: [Judgment]
  • August 10, 2021: [Judgment]
  • August 10, 2021: [Order]
  • August 06, 2021: [Order to Surrender]
March, 2021
  • March 25, 2021: [Order]
  • March 24, 2021: [Order]
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
September, 2020
  • September 22, 2020: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • September 22, 2020: [Order on Amended Motion]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: [Order Modifying Conditions of Pretrial Release]
  • June 25, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 19, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • March 18, 2020: [Order]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • December 30, 2019: [Order]
November, 2019
  • November 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
October, 2019
  • October 17, 2019: [Order]
September, 2019
  • September 20, 2019: [Order]
  • September 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • September 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
July, 2019
  • July 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
April, 2019
  • April 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • January 15, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • January 15, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 15, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • January 15, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.