U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-00046-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. CLARK
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2025
  • January 09, 2025: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • February 13, 2020: [Judgment]
  • February 13, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
January, 2020
  • January 15, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
November, 2019
  • November 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
September, 2019
  • September 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 20, 2019: [Order on Motion in Limine]
August, 2019
  • August 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • August 05, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 18, 2019: [Order]
  • January 16, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • January 16, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.