U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-00003-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. GIST, et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Repayment Agreement and Order]
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
  • December 15, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: [Judgment]
  • March 16, 2020: [Order to Surrender]
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: [Order on Petition for Action on Conditions of Pretrial Release]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • January 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • January 18, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 18, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • January 16, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • January 16, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • January 16, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.