U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-00065-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. HUNT et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • April 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 29, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
March, 2021
  • March 24, 2021: [Order]
February, 2021
  • February 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • February 03, 2021: [Order to Answer]
December, 2020
  • December 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
  • November 24, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
March, 2020
  • March 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Judgment]
September, 2019
  • September 06, 2019: [Judgment]
August, 2019
  • August 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 04, 2019: [Order]
June, 2019
  • June 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Order]
April, 2019
  • April 17, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 05, 2019: [Order]
March, 2019
  • March 20, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • March 20, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 20, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • February 19, 2019: [Order]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • January 18, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • January 18, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.