U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:18-cr-00065-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BARGE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • August 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • August 10, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - FIRST STEP ACT]
  • July 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Order]
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
  • October 13, 2021: [Order]
June, 2020
  • June 12, 2020: [Order]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Judgment]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
January, 2019
  • January 25, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • January 23, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • January 23, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • January 23, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.