U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-00003-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. PHAM
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
October, 2019
  • October 17, 2019: [Judgment]
April, 2019
  • April 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
January, 2019
  • January 25, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • January 25, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 25, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • January 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.