U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-mj-00107-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Long
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 11, 2019: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
August, 2019
  • August 02, 2019: [Judgment]
May, 2019
  • May 08, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • April 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
February, 2019
  • February 13, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • February 13, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • February 13, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.