U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00058-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. MEYERS et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
  • October 01, 2024: [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
December, 2021
  • December 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Stay]
November, 2021
  • November 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Postpone]
  • October 06, 2021: [Judgment]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Order to Surrender]
  • September 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Departure]
  • September 24, 2021: [Order to Surrender]
  • September 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Departure]
  • September 16, 2021: [Judgment]
  • September 09, 2021: [Judgment]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Judgment]
  • August 23, 2021: [Judgment]
July, 2021
  • July 22, 2021: [Order to Surrender]
  • July 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • July 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Bond]
  • July 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
June, 2021
  • June 01, 2021: [Order on Motion in Limine]
April, 2021
  • April 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 22, 2020: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • December 22, 2020: [Order on Motion to Sever Defendant]
  • December 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Voir Dire Policy]
  • December 14, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2020
  • November 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 12, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Order on Motion to Adopt]
  • October 23, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 09, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 14, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Order]
  • June 26, 2020: [Order]
  • June 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • May 18, 2020: [Order]
  • May 08, 2020: [Order]
  • May 01, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 16, 2020: [Order]
  • March 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Bond Forfeiture]
  • March 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • March 03, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • March 03, 2020: [Order of Detention]
February, 2020
  • February 10, 2020: [Order]
  • February 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
January, 2020
  • January 16, 2020: [Order]
  • January 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2019
  • August 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 10, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 09, 2019: [Order on Petition for Action on Conditions of Pretrial Release]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [Order]
May, 2019
  • May 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
April, 2019
  • April 17, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • April 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • April 04, 2019: [Order]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Order on Motion to Declare Case Complex]
  • March 14, 2019: [Order Modifying Conditions of Pretrial Release]
  • March 14, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • March 11, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • March 11, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 11, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 04, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 01, 2019: [Order]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • February 21, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 21, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • February 19, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • February 19, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • February 19, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 19, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • February 15, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • February 15, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • February 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 15, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • February 14, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • February 14, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 14, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • February 14, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • February 14, 2019: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.