U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00003-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. JANES
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
  • August 08, 2022: [Order]
May, 2022
  • May 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • December 28, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • December 27, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
January, 2020
  • January 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [Judgment]
April, 2019
  • April 09, 2019: [Order]
  • April 05, 2019: [Order]
March, 2019
  • March 18, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
February, 2019
  • February 21, 2019: [Order]
  • February 21, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • February 21, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.