U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-00007-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. SUTTON et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • January 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Judgment]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: [Judgment]
January, 2020
  • January 22, 2020: [Judgment]
  • January 15, 2020: [Order to Surrender]
December, 2019
  • December 19, 2019: [Order Modifying Conditions of Pretrial Release]
September, 2019
  • September 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [Order on Petition for Action on Conditions of Pretrial Release]
  • July 18, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • June 25, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Order]
  • April 29, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • April 24, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • April 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 27, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • March 27, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 21, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • March 21, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 21, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 08, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • March 08, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 08, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.