U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00010-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. HOLMES
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Order of Detention]
  • October 02, 2024: [Order Appointing Counsel]
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: [Judgment]
  • October 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
June, 2019
  • June 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Order]
April, 2019
  • April 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • April 05, 2019: [Order]
March, 2019
  • March 21, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • March 21, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • March 21, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.