U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-00005-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. DIXON et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Repayment Agreement and Order]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [Judgment]
  • November 20, 2019: [Judgment]
August, 2019
  • August 05, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
July, 2019
  • July 24, 2019: [Order of Detention]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • June 20, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • June 17, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
April, 2019
  • April 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2019
  • March 19, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • March 19, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • March 19, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 18, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.