U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00011-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. MULLINS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
February, 2020
  • February 19, 2020: [Order]
December, 2019
  • December 06, 2019: [Order]
  • December 05, 2019: [Order]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Psychiatric Exam]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Order]
  • September 18, 2019: [Order]
August, 2019
  • August 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • August 04, 2019: [Order]
June, 2019
  • June 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Order]
  • May 24, 2019: [Order of Commitment]
April, 2019
  • April 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • April 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 11, 2019: [Order]
  • April 10, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • April 10, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
March, 2019
  • March 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.