U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00016-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. MELVIN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
September, 2019
  • September 13, 2019: [Judgment]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • August 04, 2019: [Order]
June, 2019
  • June 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Order]
April, 2019
  • April 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • April 05, 2019: [Order]
  • April 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 01, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • March 27, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.