U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00012-2
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. HORTON et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 13, 2020: [Judgment]
March, 2020
  • March 11, 2020: [Judgment]
October, 2019
  • October 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
September, 2019
  • September 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • April 23, 2019: [Order]
  • April 18, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • April 18, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • April 17, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 26, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • March 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 25, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • March 25, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 25, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.