U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:19-cr-00014-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. DYE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order]
July, 2021
  • July 01, 2021: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
July, 2020
  • July 15, 2020: [Judgment]
June, 2020
  • June 12, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 19, 2020: [Order]
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 18, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 18, 2020: [Order]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
July, 2019
  • July 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
April, 2019
  • April 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • April 10, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 05, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • March 27, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • March 27, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.