U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:18-cr-00047-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. THORNTON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Order to Surrender]
  • September 01, 2020: [Judgment]
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: [Order to Surrender]
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
June, 2020
  • June 04, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Order]
  • May 11, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • May 11, 2020: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 18, 2020: [Order]
January, 2020
  • January 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • January 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
December, 2019
  • December 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Additional Decrease for Acceptance of Responsibility]
June, 2019
  • June 14, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
May, 2019
  • May 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
April, 2019
  • April 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • April 08, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 08, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • April 04, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • April 04, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • April 04, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.