U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00017-2
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. WORKS et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 07, 2020: [Judgment]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
January, 2020
  • January 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
December, 2019
  • December 10, 2019: [Order]
October, 2019
  • October 02, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • October 02, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Order]
August, 2019
  • August 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • August 04, 2019: [Order]
June, 2019
  • June 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Order]
  • May 10, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • May 09, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • May 09, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.