U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-00014-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. FLAKES
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Judgment]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [COVID-19 Public Health and Safety Standing Order]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • July 02, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 04, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • December 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2019
  • October 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2019
  • July 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
May, 2019
  • May 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • May 02, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.