U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-00016-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. AGUILERA-ESPINAL et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
  • September 17, 2019: [Judgment]
July, 2019
  • July 12, 2019: [Judgment]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [Judgment]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [Judgment]
  • May 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • May 16, 2019: [Order of Detention]
April, 2019
  • April 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • April 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 17, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • April 16, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.