U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-mc-00001
  • Case Name: STORY v. AMOS et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
June, 2020
  • June 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Disbursement of Funds]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Disbursement of Funds]
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [Order on Motion for Disbursement of Funds]
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Disbursement of Funds]
February, 2020
  • February 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Disbursement of Funds]
January, 2020
  • January 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Disbursement of Funds]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Disbursement of Funds]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Disbursement of Funds]
  • November 19, 2019: [Writ of Garnishment]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Disbursement of Funds]
  • September 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Disbursement of Funds]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Writ of Garnishment]
  • May 07, 2019: [Writ of Garnishment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.