U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-00010-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BROWN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: [Judgment]
September, 2019
  • September 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2019
  • August 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 20, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
May, 2019
  • May 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • May 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • May 10, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • May 10, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.