U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00022-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. ROJAS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2020
  • February 06, 2020: [Judgment]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Order]
August, 2019
  • August 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • August 04, 2019: [Order]
June, 2019
  • June 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Order]
  • May 14, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • May 14, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 14, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.