U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:07-cr-00077-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Ross
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 04, 2022: [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
September, 2020
  • September 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
August, 2020
  • August 25, 2020: [Order]
October, 2019
  • October 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
July, 2019
  • July 22, 2019: [Order]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • May 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.