U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-00016-1
  • Case Name: USA v. KENNEDY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 01, 2020: [Judgment]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 02, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 04, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
  • March 12, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
January, 2020
  • January 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
June, 2019
  • June 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • June 13, 2019: [Order on Amended Motion]
  • June 07, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • June 06, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
May, 2019
  • May 21, 2019: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.