U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-00022-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. STEPHENS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Judgment]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
August, 2019
  • August 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2019
  • July 19, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 19, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • July 11, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
May, 2019
  • May 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.