U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-00017-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BENTLEY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 24, 2020: [Judgment]
  • July 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Departure]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 11, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
July, 2019
  • July 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
June, 2019
  • June 05, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • June 04, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • June 03, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
May, 2019
  • May 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.