U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00023-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. COOPER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
February, 2021
  • February 08, 2021: [Repayment Agreement and Order]
December, 2020
  • December 31, 2020: [Judgment]
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 14, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
  • March 09, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2019
  • June 20, 2019: [Order]
  • June 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • June 11, 2019: [Order]
  • June 06, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 06, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
May, 2019
  • May 24, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.