U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00024-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. NELSON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Judgment]
July, 2021
  • July 01, 2021: [Order]
April, 2021
  • April 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 17, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
February, 2021
  • February 12, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • February 12, 2021: [Order]
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
  • December 01, 2020: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • December 01, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • December 01, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.