U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00030-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BELL et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
April, 2022
  • April 07, 2022: [Order]
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
November, 2020
  • November 19, 2020: [Judgment]
  • November 18, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
September, 2020
  • September 03, 2020: [Judgment]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 17, 2020: [Order Modifying Conditions of Pretrial Release]
  • July 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • May 18, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Want of Prosecution]
  • May 12, 2020: [Order]
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Order]
  • March 27, 2020: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
February, 2020
  • February 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Travel]
  • February 12, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 29, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 29, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • January 23, 2020: [Order]
  • January 15, 2020: [Order]
  • January 10, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • January 03, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
December, 2019
  • December 10, 2019: [Order]
October, 2019
  • October 02, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Order]
August, 2019
  • August 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • August 04, 2019: [Order]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Order Modifying Conditions of Pretrial Release]
  • June 28, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • June 27, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • June 27, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • June 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 27, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 27, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 24, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.