U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00011-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. MCCAFFREY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Travel]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Judgment]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Order]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 16, 2020: [Order]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
June, 2019
  • June 14, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • June 13, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 13, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.