U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00032-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. PITTS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 07, 2020: [Judgment]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Order]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
December, 2019
  • December 10, 2019: [Order]
October, 2019
  • October 02, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Order]
August, 2019
  • August 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • August 04, 2019: [Order]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • July 16, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 16, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.