U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:19-cr-00027-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BRADLEY et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
  • August 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 04, 2021: [Order]
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [Order]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 18, 2021: [Judgment]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Judgment]
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
November, 2020
  • November 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Additional Decrease for Acceptance of Responsibility]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 22, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • July 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • July 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • July 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: [Order]
  • June 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Reveal the Deal]
  • June 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • June 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • June 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
April, 2020
  • April 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Bond]
  • April 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • April 14, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 18, 2020: [Order]
  • March 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
February, 2020
  • February 20, 2020: [Order]
  • February 05, 2020: [Order]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Order]
  • January 09, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
December, 2019
  • December 02, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Bond]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Expert Services]
July, 2019
  • July 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • July 10, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 09, 2019: [Order]
  • July 09, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • July 09, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 05, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.