U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-00026-2
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. STERLING et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2021
  • November 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Judgment]
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 17, 2020: [Judgment]
  • December 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2020
  • October 07, 2020: [Judgment]
  • October 05, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • October 01, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2020
  • September 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
  • July 08, 2020: [Order]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2020
  • June 19, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 19, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Psychiatric Exam]
  • June 16, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 20, 2020: [Order]
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Order]
  • April 29, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
  • March 12, 2020: [Judgment]
February, 2020
  • February 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • February 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Psychiatric Exam]
January, 2020
  • January 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2019
  • November 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • October 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • August 13, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 12, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 06, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 06, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 06, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • July 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • July 18, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • July 16, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 15, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 15, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 15, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 12, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • July 12, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 10, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 26, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • June 26, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 21, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.