U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00017-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. LASTER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
May, 2021
  • May 13, 2021: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Judgment]
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 21, 2020: [Order]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 19, 2020: [Order on Motion for Additional Decrease for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 16, 2020: [Order]
August, 2019
  • August 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • June 26, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • June 24, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • June 24, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • June 24, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.