U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00031-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. KING
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 21, 2020: [Judgment]
October, 2020
  • October 14, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
April, 2020
  • April 23, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
  • March 04, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • January 30, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • January 30, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 29, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Order]
August, 2019
  • August 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • August 01, 2019: [Order]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • July 30, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 23, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.