U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00033-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. PARKS et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Order Regarding Motion for Sentence Reduction - FIRST STEP ACT]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [Judgment]
October, 2020
  • October 14, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
June, 2020
  • June 16, 2020: [Judgment]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Order]
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
January, 2020
  • January 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
November, 2019
  • November 15, 2019: [Order]
October, 2019
  • October 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Order]
  • September 10, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2019
  • August 01, 2019: [Order]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • July 30, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 24, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 23, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.