U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:19-cr-00025-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. SIMMONS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [Judgment]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Order]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Order on Motion in Limine]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Order]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Order]
November, 2021
  • November 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Order on Sealed Motion]
September, 2021
  • September 16, 2021: [Order]
July, 2021
  • July 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Order]
  • June 16, 2021: [Order]
  • June 01, 2021: [Order]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 17, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2021
  • January 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Quash]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
  • December 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 08, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
  • October 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • October 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Supplement]
September, 2020
  • September 25, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • September 09, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
  • August 05, 2020: [Order]
  • August 04, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 18, 2020: [Order]
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 18, 2020: [Order]
  • March 16, 2020: [Order]
February, 2020
  • February 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • February 07, 2020: [Order]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Order]
October, 2019
  • October 23, 2019: [Order]
September, 2019
  • September 18, 2019: [Order]
August, 2019
  • August 16, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 14, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 13, 2019: [Order]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • July 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.