U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-00032-2
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. COKER et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2024
  • December 16, 2024: [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Judgment]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order on Petition for Action on Conditions of Pretrial Release]
May, 2021
  • May 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 09, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2020
  • October 01, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Judgment]
August, 2020
  • August 25, 2020: [Judgment]
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 08, 2020: [Order]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2020
  • June 18, 2020: [Order on Motion to Modify]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
February, 2020
  • February 19, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • February 05, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • February 05, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 05, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
January, 2020
  • January 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
December, 2019
  • December 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • December 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2019
  • November 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2019
  • October 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2019
  • September 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2019
  • August 22, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • August 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • August 22, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 18, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
July, 2019
  • July 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.