U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-00033-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. HUCKABA et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
July, 2022
  • July 01, 2022: [Order of Detention]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
June, 2021
  • June 08, 2021: [Judgment]
May, 2021
  • May 14, 2021: [Judgment]
April, 2021
  • April 02, 2021: [Judgment]
February, 2021
  • February 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
October, 2020
  • October 01, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2020
  • June 19, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 19, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
January, 2020
  • January 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 25, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • August 22, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • August 22, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 18, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 07, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 07, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 07, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2019
  • July 24, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 24, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 24, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.