U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00032-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. HUMPHRIES
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: [Judgment]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2021
  • January 25, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 08, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2020
  • July 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
May, 2020
  • May 19, 2020: [Order]
  • May 01, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Order]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2019
  • November 15, 2019: [Order]
October, 2019
  • October 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Order]
August, 2019
  • August 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • August 01, 2019: [Order]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 30, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 23, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.