U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:19-cr-00028-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. CRAWFORD
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Judgment]
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • August 10, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 02, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 02, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 19, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 30, 2022: [Order]
May, 2022
  • May 02, 2022: [Judgment]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 28, 2022: [Order to Surrender]
  • April 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • September 14, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • September 13, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • September 13, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • September 08, 2021: [Order]
  • September 07, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • September 03, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 12, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 12, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • July 12, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
November, 2020
  • November 09, 2020: [Judgment]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
June, 2020
  • June 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Additional Decrease for Acceptance of Responsibility]
May, 2020
  • May 08, 2020: [Order]
  • May 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 18, 2020: [Order]
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2019
  • August 21, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • August 20, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
July, 2019
  • July 24, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 24, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 24, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.