U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00039-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. HITCHCOCK
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • September 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • September 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • September 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal]
  • September 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • September 30, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Order]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
  • January 19, 2022: [Order]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
November, 2020
  • November 06, 2020: [Judgment]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
December, 2019
  • December 10, 2019: [Order]
October, 2019
  • October 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Order]
  • September 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
August, 2019
  • August 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • August 10, 2019: [Order]
  • August 07, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • August 06, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 06, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.