U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-00028-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. SPARKS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • November 16, 2021: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • November 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
August, 2021
  • August 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
July, 2021
  • July 15, 2021: [Order]
March, 2021
  • March 25, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
June, 2020
  • June 11, 2020: [Order to Surrender]
  • June 05, 2020: [Judgment]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 18, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 18, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
  • March 04, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
August, 2019
  • August 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • August 02, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 01, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.