U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-00047-1
  • Case Name: USA v. VILLAFUENTE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Judgment]
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2020
  • October 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
May, 2020
  • May 04, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
January, 2020
  • January 24, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 23, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
December, 2019
  • December 19, 2019: [Order Modifying Conditions of Pretrial Release]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Order on Sealed Motion]
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • October 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
September, 2019
  • September 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2019
  • August 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • August 23, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 23, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.