U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-00039-1
  • Case Name: USA v. AMBROSE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 23, 2020: [Judgment]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 10, 2020: [Order]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 04, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
November, 2019
  • November 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: [Order on Petition for Action on Conditions of Pretrial Release]
September, 2019
  • September 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2019
  • August 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • August 23, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 23, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.