U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00052-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BEAVERS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 24, 2020: [Judgment]
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
February, 2020
  • February 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
November, 2019
  • November 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
September, 2019
  • September 18, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • September 18, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • September 17, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
August, 2019
  • August 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.