U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00037-3
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. LAW et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 01, 2024: [Order on Sentence Reduction - USSC Amendment - Amendment 821]
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Order]
September, 2021
  • September 10, 2021: [Order]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
November, 2020
  • November 18, 2020: [Judgment]
October, 2020
  • October 14, 2020: [Judgment]
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
  • October 07, 2020: [Order to Surrender]
September, 2020
  • September 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 04, 2020: [Judgment]
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 12, 2020: [Order]
  • May 01, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2019
  • December 26, 2019: [Order on Petition for Action on Conditions of Pretrial Release]
November, 2019
  • November 01, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2019
  • October 11, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • October 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Declare Case Complex]
  • October 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Order]
  • September 18, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 18, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • September 18, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • September 17, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • September 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 28, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 28, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 26, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 26, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 26, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.