U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00047-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. THOMPSON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 03, 2022: [Judgment]
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2021
  • September 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 11, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2021
  • January 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
September, 2020
  • September 18, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • August 26, 2020: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
April, 2020
  • April 02, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
February, 2020
  • February 12, 2020: [Order on Motion in Limine]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • January 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2019
  • September 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 28, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 28, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.